05/17/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/06/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/06/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Filed |