03/21/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
03/13/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/11/2019 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 02/25/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 12/07/2018 | Filed |