Senate | 05/01/2019 | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Record vote RV#749 | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/26/2019 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Filed |