Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR102 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/04/2019

                            86R14930 SMH-D
 By: Toth H.J.R. No. 102


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 to provide for the appraisal of certain real property for ad valorem
 tax purposes based on its purchase price, exempting all tangible
 personal property in this state from ad valorem taxation, and
 authorizing the legislature to permit legislators to appoint
 members of the board of equalization for an appraisal entity.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (k) and
 (l) to read as follows:
 (b)  All real property [and tangible personal property] in
 this State, unless exempt as required or permitted by this
 Constitution, whether owned by natural persons or corporations,
 other than municipal, shall be taxed in proportion to its value,
 which shall be ascertained as may be provided by law. All tangible
 personal property in this State is exempt from ad valorem taxation,
 except as provided by Subsection (l) of this section.
 (k)  Notwithstanding Subsections (a), (b), and (i) of this
 section, for each tax year following the year in which the property
 was purchased until the end of the tax year in which the ownership
 of the property changes, the legislature by general law may limit
 the maximum appraised value of residential property consisting of
 not more than four individual dwelling units, including a
 single-family home, or of a tract of unimproved land for ad valorem
 tax purposes to the lesser of the market value of the property as
 determined by the appraisal entity or the sum of the amount the
 owner of the property paid for the property and the initial market
 value of each new improvement to the property. The applicability of
 a general law enacted under this subsection must be limited to a
 bona fide purchaser for value of a property who, in the manner
 provided by law, applies for the limitation on appraised value
 under this subsection not later than a date prescribed by general
 law in the tax year following the year in which the person purchased
 the property. The legislature may prescribe or delegate to an
 appropriate public official or entity the authority to prescribe
 standards and procedures to administer a law enacted under this
 subsection, including criteria to be used to determine whether a
 person was a bona fide purchaser for value.
 (l)  If before January 1, 2022, an ad valorem tax on tangible
 personal property is pledged for the payment of a debt, the
 appropriate tax authorities may continue to levy and collect the
 tax against that tangible personal property at the same rate as the
 pledged tax until the debt is discharged, if cessation of the levy
 and collection of the tax would impair the obligation of the
 contract by which the debt was created. This subsection applies to
 tangible personal property that was taxable under the law in effect
 on January 1, 2021, but that became exempt under Subsection (b) of
 this section on January 1, 2022, as a result of the amendment of
 this section adopted by the voters in 2019 to exempt all tangible
 personal property from ad valorem taxation.
 SECTION 2.  Section 8, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8.  All real property of railroad companies shall be
 assessed, and the taxes collected in the several counties in which
 said real property is situated, including so much of the roadbed and
 fixtures as shall be in each county. [The rolling stock may be
 assessed in gross in the county where the principal office of the
 company is located, and the county tax paid upon it shall be
 apportioned as provided by general law in proportion to the
 distance such road may run through any such county, among the
 several counties through which the road passes, as a part of their
 tax assets.]
 SECTION 3.  Section 18(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The Legislature, by general law, shall provide for a
 single board of equalization for each appraisal entity consisting
 of qualified persons residing within the territory appraised by
 that entity. The Legislature, by general law, may authorize a
 single board of equalization for two or more adjoining appraisal
 entities that elect to provide for consolidated equalizations.
 Members of a board of equalization may not be elected officials of a
 county or of the governing body of a taxing unit. Notwithstanding
 Section 1, Article II, of this constitution, the Legislature, by
 general law, may provide for the appointment of members of the board
 of equalization for an appraisal entity by the state senators and
 state representatives whose districts contain any part of the
 territory appraised by that entity.
 SECTION 4.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. The constitutional amendment
 authorizing the legislature to provide for the appraisal of certain
 real property for ad valorem tax purposes based on its purchase
 price, exempting all tangible personal property in this state from
 ad valorem taxation, and authorizing the legislature to permit
 legislators to appoint members of the board of equalization for an
 appraisal entity takes effect January 1, 2022, and applies only to
 taxes imposed on or after that date. This temporary provision
 expires January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 5.  The following provisions of Article VIII, Texas
 Constitution, are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 1(d), (e), and (g);
 (2)  Section 1-i;
 (3)  Section 1-j;
 (4)  Section 1-n, as proposed by S.J.R. 47, 77th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2001;
 (5)  Section 1-n, as proposed by S.J.R. 6, 77th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2001;
 (6)  Section 19; and
 (7)  Section 19a.
 SECTION 6.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature to provide for the appraisal of certain residential or
 unimproved real property for ad valorem tax purposes based on its
 purchase price, exempting all tangible personal property in this
 state from ad valorem taxation, and authorizing the legislature to
 permit legislators to appoint members of the board of equalization
 for an appraisal entity."