Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR110 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/12/2019

                            H.R. No. 110


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Carolyn Ericson, a respected member of the
 Nacogdoches community, passed away on December 2, 2018, at the age
 of 87; and
 WHEREAS, The former Carolyn Reeves was born to Jonathan and
 Emma Reeves on May 12, 1931, in Fort Stockton; during her youth, her
 parents took her around the country to track down their lineage, an
 experience that inspired her own passion for genealogy; and
 WHEREAS, She married Joe Ericson on July 16, 1955, in
 Lubbock, and the couple moved to Nacogdoches two years later;
 there, they raised three children, Linda, Joseph, and John, and
 with the passing years, Mrs. Ericson had the privilege of welcoming
 into her family three grandchildren, Jonathan, Angela, and William,
 and two great-grandchildren, Lexington and Evelyn; and
 WHEREAS, Over the course of her career, Mrs. Ericson
 performed extensive historical research, collecting approximately
 $200,000 worth of literature and cataloguing cemetery and census
 records, and she also clipped and digitized obituaries of some
 42,000 people buried in Nacogdoches County; in 2018, she donated
 much of her library to the Stephen F. Austin State University East
 Texas Research Center; and
 WHEREAS, In addition to her research, Mrs. Ericson
 established her own publishing company, Ericson Books, authored
 more than 100 books, and wrote a weekly genealogical column,
 "Kissin' Kuzzins," which appeared in several East Texas newspapers
 for more than four decades; she also served as curator of the Old
 Stone Fort Museum from 1972 to 1980 and took an active role in
 numerous genealogical and heritage societies, including the
 Daughters of the Republic of Texas; moreover, she was a longtime
 congregant of First United Methodist Church; and
 WHEREAS, While the death of Carolyn Ericson brings
 immeasurable sorrow to her family and friends, she leaves behind a
 legacy that will forever be treasured by all those who held her
 dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Carolyn Ericson and
 extend sincere condolences to all who mourn her passing; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Carolyn
 Ericson.
 Clardy
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 110 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 6, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House