Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1138 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/24/2019

                            H.R. No. 1138


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Countless lives were touched by the kindness and
 generosity of Doris Ann Brown Morriss of Sonora, who passed away on
 March 5, 2019, at the age of 89; and
 WHEREAS, The former Dori
 s Brown was born to Steve and Elsie
 Brown on August 13, 1929, in Rocksprings and grew up with a sister,
 D., and two brothers, Steve and Horace; she graduated from high
 school in Rocksprings and went on to earn a bachelor's degree at
 Southwestern University in home economics; and
 WHEREAS, She married Tommy Morriss on June 10, 1950, and in
 the course of a rewarding union that spanned 58 years, the couple
 lived in Balmorhea, Uvalde, and Sonora, where they owned a ranch;
 Mrs. Morris excelled as a homemaker, cook, and hostess, and she was
 also involved in several sewing clubs and enjoyed making
 handicrafts; she took great pride in her children, Mindy, Ann, and
 Steve, and with the passing years, she had the pleasure of seeing
 her family grow to include seven grandchildren, Travis, Morriss,
 Holly, Ashlie, Desirae, Ethan, and Stephani, and eight
 great-grandchildren, Cooper, Clay Tom, Hudson, James, Will,
 Payton, Thomas, and Bronson; and
 WHEREAS, Strong in her faith, Mrs. Morriss made church a
 priority throughout her life, and she participated in a number of
 church groups; in addition, she served as president of the Uvalde
 Area Chamber of Commerce and gave freely of her time and talents to
 the Uvalde Grand Opera House and the women's auxiliary for Lillian
 M. Hudspeth Memorial Hospital in Sonora; and
 WHEREAS, Doris Morriss lived a life that was rich in family,
 friends, and community service, and those who were privileged to
 share in her love and affection will forever hold her close in their
 hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Doris Ann Brown
 Morriss and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn her
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Doris
 Morriss.
 Murr
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1138 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 18, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House