House | 04/25/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Withdrawn from calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Filed |