House | 03/08/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Adopted | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 02/12/2019 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 01/25/2019 | Filed |