H.R. No. 219 R E S O L U T I O N WHEREAS, The citizens of Lufkin lost an esteemed community leader with the death of Louis Alan Bronaugh on November 24, 2018, at the age of 87; and WHEREAS, The son of Louis and Nina Bronaugh, Louis Bronaugh was born in Dallas on May 28, 1931, and he grew up with the companionship of a brother, Bob; following his graduation from Lamar High School, he answered his nation's call to duty and served in the U.S. Navy during the Korean War; returning to civilian life, he continued his education at Texas Tech University; and WHEREAS, Mr. Bronaugh enjoyed the love and support of his wife, Charda, and they shared a rewarding marriage that spanned more than six decades; he took great pride in his children, Timothy, Tina, Mike, and Belinda, and with the passing years, he had the pleasure of seeing his family grow to include four grandchildren, Christa, Alan, Rand, and Perrin, and three great-grandchildren, Ava, Jason, and Timothy; and WHEREAS, In the course of his career as an optician, Mr. Bronaugh worked at The Eye Clinic in Lufkin, and in 1974, he and his wife established Bronaugh Independent Opticians; deeply devoted to the Lufkin community, he served on the city council and further distinguished himself through an exceptional 18-year tenure as mayor; and WHEREAS, Mr. Bronaugh also dedicated his time to a number of area organizations, including the Angelina & Neches River Authority; he was appointed to the agency's board of directors on October 16, 2000, and was reappointed on April 12, 2012, to hold a second term; he benefited the group through his service in several officer positions, among them secretary-treasurer of the board, and he was instrumental to the authority's success in managing the quality, development, and conservation of water resources in the Neches River Basin; and WHEREAS, In recognition of his outstanding efforts, Mr. Bronaugh received numerous honors over the years, including the 1986 Angelina Award from the Angelina County Chamber of Commerce and the Silver Beaver Award and BSA Distinguished Citizen Good Turn Award from the East Texas Area Council, Boy Scouts of America; and WHEREAS, The life of Louis Bronaugh stands as an inspiring example of the good that one person can accomplish, and his achievements will be remembered and admired for many years to come; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Louis Alan Bronaugh and extend heartfelt sympathy to his family and many friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Louis Alan Bronaugh. Ashby ______________________________ Speaker of the House I certify that H.R. No. 219 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on March 6, 2019. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House