Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR219 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/08/2019

                            H.R. No. 219


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The citizens of Lufkin lost an esteemed community
 leader with the death of Louis Alan Bronaugh on November 24, 2018,
 at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Louis and Nina Bronaugh, Louis Bronaugh
 was born in Dallas on May 28, 1931, and he grew up with the
 companionship of a brother, Bob; following his graduation from
 Lamar High School, he answered his nation's call to duty and served
 in the U.S. Navy during the Korean War; returning to civilian life,
 he continued his education at Texas Tech University; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Bronaugh enjoyed the love and support of his
 wife, Charda, and they shared a rewarding marriage that spanned
 more than six decades; he took great pride in his children, Timothy,
 Tina, Mike, and Belinda, and with the passing years, he had the
 pleasure of seeing his family grow to include four grandchildren,
 Christa, Alan, Rand, and Perrin, and three great-grandchildren,
 Ava, Jason, and Timothy; and
 WHEREAS, In the course of his career as an optician,
 Mr. Bronaugh worked at The Eye Clinic in Lufkin, and in 1974, he and
 his wife established Bronaugh Independent Opticians; deeply
 devoted to the Lufkin community, he served on the city council and
 further distinguished himself through an exceptional 18-year
 tenure as mayor; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Bronaugh also dedicated his time to a number of
 area organizations, including the Angelina & Neches River
 Authority; he was appointed to the agency's board of directors on
 October 16, 2000, and was reappointed on April 12, 2012, to hold a
 second term; he benefited the group through his service in several
 officer positions, among them secretary-treasurer of the board, and
 he was instrumental to the authority's success in managing the
 quality, development, and conservation of water resources in the
 Neches River Basin; and
 WHEREAS, In recognition of his outstanding efforts,
 Mr. Bronaugh received numerous honors over the years, including the
 1986 Angelina Award from the Angelina County Chamber of Commerce
 and the Silver Beaver Award and BSA Distinguished Citizen Good Turn
 Award from the East Texas Area Council, Boy Scouts of America; and
 WHEREAS, The life of Louis Bronaugh stands as an inspiring
 example of the good that one person can accomplish, and his
 achievements will be remembered and admired for many years to come;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Louis Alan Bronaugh
 and extend heartfelt sympathy to his family and many friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Louis Alan
 Bronaugh.
 Ashby
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 219 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 6, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House