Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR219 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.R. No. 219
1+86R10066 SME-D
2+ By: Ashby H.R. No. 219
23
34
45 R E S O L U T I O N
56 WHEREAS, The citizens of Lufkin lost an esteemed community
67 leader with the death of Louis Alan Bronaugh on November 24, 2018,
78 at the age of 87; and
89 WHEREAS, The son of Louis and Nina Bronaugh, Louis Bronaugh
910 was born in Dallas on May 28, 1931, and he grew up with the
1011 companionship of a brother, Bob; following his graduation from
1112 Lamar High School, he answered his nation's call to duty and served
1213 in the U.S. Navy during the Korean War; returning to civilian life,
1314 he continued his education at Texas Tech University; and
1415 WHEREAS, Mr. Bronaugh enjoyed the love and support of his
1516 wife, Charda, and they shared a rewarding marriage that spanned
1617 more than six decades; he took great pride in his children, Timothy,
1718 Tina, Mike, and Belinda, and with the passing years, he had the
1819 pleasure of seeing his family grow to include four grandchildren,
1920 Christa, Alan, Rand, and Perrin, and three great-grandchildren,
2021 Ava, Jason, and Timothy; and
2122 WHEREAS, In the course of his career as an optician,
2223 Mr. Bronaugh worked at The Eye Clinic in Lufkin, and in 1974, he and
2324 his wife established Bronaugh Independent Opticians; deeply
2425 devoted to the Lufkin community, he served on the city council and
2526 further distinguished himself through an exceptional 18-year
2627 tenure as mayor; and
2728 WHEREAS, Mr. Bronaugh also dedicated his time to a number of
2829 area organizations, including the Angelina & Neches River
2930 Authority; he was appointed to the agency's board of directors on
3031 October 16, 2000, and was reappointed on April 12, 2012, to hold a
3132 second term; he benefited the group through his service in several
3233 officer positions, among them secretary-treasurer of the board, and
3334 he was instrumental to the authority's success in managing the
3435 quality, development, and conservation of water resources in the
3536 Neches River Basin; and
3637 WHEREAS, In recognition of his outstanding efforts,
3738 Mr. Bronaugh received numerous honors over the years, including the
3839 1986 Angelina Award from the Angelina County Chamber of Commerce
3940 and the Silver Beaver Award and BSA Distinguished Citizen Good Turn
4041 Award from the East Texas Area Council, Boy Scouts of America; and
4142 WHEREAS, The life of Louis Bronaugh stands as an inspiring
4243 example of the good that one person can accomplish, and his
4344 achievements will be remembered and admired for many years to come;
4445 now, therefore, be it
4546 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
4647 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Louis Alan Bronaugh
4748 and extend heartfelt sympathy to his family and many friends; and,
4849 be it further
4950 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
5051 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
5152 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Louis Alan
5253 Bronaugh.
53- Ashby
54- ______________________________
55- Speaker of the House
56- I certify that H.R. No. 219 was unanimously adopted by a
57- rising vote of the House on March 6, 2019.
58- ______________________________
59- Chief Clerk of the House