Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR220 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/08/2019

                            H.R. No. 220


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, All who shared in the life of Julie Evelyn Dowell of
 Bullard were deeply saddened by her passing on January 11, 2019, at
 the age of 65; and
 WHEREAS, Julie Dowell was born in Marshall on May 20, 1953, to
 Greer and Mary Dowell, and she grew up with the companionship of a
 brother, Dan; she graduated from Hillcrest High School in Dallas in
 1971 and went on to enjoy a career in law enforcement, serving as a
 police officer and detective in Colorado Springs and as a special
 deputy U.S. marshal for the Northern District of Texas; in
 addition, she was a co-owner of Dan Lester Drilling Company; and
 WHEREAS, An active member of her community, Ms. Dowell served
 area residents through her involvement in a number of committees
 and associations, including the boards of the YMCA and the Emerald
 Bay Club, and she coached softball, volleyball, and soccer at
 Trinity Christian Academy; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Dowell further benefited her fellow citizens as
 a member of the board of directors for the Angelina & Neches River
 Authority for 18 years; appointed on October 16, 2000, she went on
 to serve three terms and distinguished herself in several officer
 positions, including president of the board; her dedication and
 hard work were instrumental to the authority's success in managing
 the quality, development, and conservation of water resources in
 the Neches River Basin; and
 WHEREAS, Although Julie Dowell's death has brought great
 sorrow to those who held her dear, her life was an inspiring example
 of the good that one person can accomplish; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Julie Evelyn Dowell
 and extend heartfelt sympathy to her family and many friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Julie
 Evelyn Dowell.
 Ashby
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 220 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 6, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House