Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR47 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/11/2019

                            H.R. No. 47


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life filled with joyful times and
 meaningful accomplishments remain to comfort the family and friends
 of Jack Raymond Stone, who passed away on August 13, 2017, at the
 age of 86; and
 WHEREAS, Jack Stone was born to Marshall and Jewell Stone on
 September 8, 1930, in Nacogdoches; he graduated from both
 Nacogdoches High School and Stephen F. Austin State University with
 honors and served in the United States military; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Stone enjoyed a successful career in banking,
 and he served the First State Bank of Wells as president; he also
 chaired the Texas Parks and Wildlife Commission, and he helped the
 Texas State Railroad's "iron horse" become a nationally recognized
 tourist attraction; at the age of 60, he moved to Montana, where he
 embarked on a second career as an attorney and won a case before the
 Montana Supreme Court; and
 WHEREAS, A dedicated family man, Mr. Stone wed Shirley Bailey
 on August 2, 1952, and the couple shared a rewarding marriage that
 spanned nearly four decades; following Mrs. Stone's death in 1991,
 Mr. Stone was fortunate enough to find love again with his second
 wife, the former Sara Benchoff; he took great pride in his children,
 Robin and Bryant, and his stepchildren, Ed and Sara, and with the
 passing years, he was further blessed with a number of cherished
 grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, In his leisure time, Mr. Stone could often be found
 hunting, fishing, or simply enjoying the outdoors; he received
 numerous awards for his contributions to his community, and he
 published an autobiography, Every Man Dies, Not Every Man Lives, in
 2010; and
 WHEREAS, While the death of Jack Stone has brought
 immeasurable sorrow to his family and friends, he has left behind a
 legacy that will forever be treasured by all those who held him
 dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 86th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Jack Raymond Stone and
 extend sincere condolences to his loved ones; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Jack Stone.
 Clardy
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 47 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on March 6, 2019.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House