Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1041 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/20/2019

                    By: Taylor S.B. No. 1041
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2019; March 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water & Rural Affairs;
 March 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the deadline by which the Texas Water Development Board
 is required to identify and designate brackish groundwater
 production zones for certain areas of the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4(b), Chapter 990 (H.B. 30), Acts of the
 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2032 [2022], the Texas Water
 Development Board shall identify and designate brackish
 groundwater production zones for areas of this state not described
 by Subsection (a) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *