Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1041 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/15/2019

                            S.B. No. 1041


 AN ACT
 relating to the deadline by which the Texas Water Development Board
 is required to identify and designate brackish groundwater
 production zones for certain areas of the state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 4(b), Chapter 990 (H.B. 30), Acts of the
 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2032 [2022], the Texas Water
 Development Board shall identify and designate brackish
 groundwater production zones for areas of this state not described
 by Subsection (a) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1041 passed the Senate on
 April 2, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1041 passed the House on
 May 14, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 5, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor