Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1041 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019