Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1056 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/22/2019

                            S.B. No. 1056


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of physicians to delegate to certain
 pharmacists the implementation and modification of a patient's drug
 therapy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 157.101(b-1), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b-1)  A delegation under Subsection (b) may include:
 (1)  the implementation or modification of a patient's
 drug therapy under a protocol if:
 (A)  the delegation follows a diagnosis, initial
 patient assessment, and drug therapy order by the physician; and
 (B)  the pharmacist maintains a copy of the
 protocol for inspection until at least the seventh anniversary of
 the expiration date of the protocol; or
 (2)  [, including] the authority to sign a prescription
 drug order for dangerous drugs for a patient[,] if:
 (A) [(1)]  the delegation follows a diagnosis,
 initial patient assessment, and drug therapy order by the
 physician;
 (B) [(2)]  the pharmacist practices in a
 hospital, hospital-based clinic, or an academic health care
 institution;
 (C) [(3)]  the hospital, hospital-based clinic,
 or academic health care institution in which the pharmacist
 practices has bylaws and a medical staff policy that permit a
 physician to delegate to a pharmacist the management of a patient's
 drug therapy;
 (D) [(4)]  the pharmacist provides the name,
 address, and telephone number of the pharmacist and of the
 delegating physician on each prescription signed by the pharmacist;
 and
 (E) [(5)]  the pharmacist provides a copy of the
 protocol to the Texas State Board of Pharmacy.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2019, the Texas State
 Board of Pharmacy shall adopt rules necessary to implement Section
 554.057, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1056 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1056 passed the House on
 May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor