Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | By: Hancock, Johnson, West S.B. No. 1060 | |
2 | - | (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2019; March 7, 2019, | |
3 | - | read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental | |
4 | - | Relations; April 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following | |
5 | - | vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 3, 2019, sent to printer.) | |
6 | - | Click here to see the committee vote | |
1 | + | 86R8534 JCG-F | |
2 | + | By: Hancock, Johnson S.B. No. 1060 | |
7 | 3 | ||
8 | 4 | ||
9 | 5 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
10 | 6 | AN ACT | |
11 | 7 | relating to the continuation of a health care provider | |
12 | 8 | participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District. | |
13 | 9 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
14 | 10 | SECTION 1. Section 298A.004, Health and Safety Code, is | |
15 | 11 | amended to read as follows: | |
16 | 12 | Sec. 298A.004. EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section | |
17 | 13 | 298A.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and | |
18 | 14 | operate a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2025 | |
19 | 15 | [2019]. | |
20 | 16 | (b) This chapter expires December 31, 2025 [2019]. | |
21 | 17 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. | |
22 | - | * * * * * |