By: Hancock, Johnson, West S.B. No. 1060 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2019; March 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; April 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 3, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the continuation of a health care provider participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 298A.004, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 298A.004. EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section 298A.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and operate a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2025 [2019]. (b) This chapter expires December 31, 2025 [2019]. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *