Senate | 05/14/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |