Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote RV#1672
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Amended 1-Phelan
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 14-S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 13-Price
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 12-Miller
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 11-Oliverson
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 10-Coleman, S. Thompson, and Rose
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 9-Sheffield
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 8-Sheffield
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 7-Ortega
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 6-Cortez
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 5-Shaheen
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 4-Raymond
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 3-Raymond
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 2-Raymond
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 1-Frank
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|