Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1134 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019