86R12985 EAS-F By: Johnson, West S.B. No. 1145 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to reports on the prevalence of eating disorders and eating disorder-related deaths in this state. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) The Department of State Health Services, in collaboration with the Health and Human Services Commission, shall prepare a report on the prevalence of eating disorders and eating disorder-related deaths in this state. The report must include: (1) statewide and regional statistics regarding the prevalence of eating disorders and eating disorder-related deaths in this state; (2) an overview of national trends in eating disorders; and (3) an overview of state-funded behavioral health treatment options available to persons with eating disorders. (b) The department shall gather information for the report required by Subsection (a) of this section from: (1) information collected by the department and commission, including information from the vital statistics unit and the state Medicaid program; and (2) hospitals, treatment centers, available surveys, and other relevant sources. (c) Not later than December 1, 2020, the Department of State Health Services and the Health and Human Services Commission shall prepare and submit to the legislature a copy of the report and any recommendations for legislative or other action to reduce the prevalence of eating disorders in this state. The department may post the report on the department's Internet website. (d) This section expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. (a) The Department of State Health Services shall prepare a report on the prevalence of eating disorders among youth in this state. When administering the Youth Risk Behavior Survey created by the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to youth in this state, the department may include additional questions as necessary to assist the department in assessing the prevalence of eating disorders among youth in this state for purposes of the report. (b) The Department of State Health Services may accept gifts, grants, and donations from any source to fund expenses incurred by the department in preparing the report under this section. (c) Not later than December 1, 2022, the Department of State Health Services shall submit to the legislature a copy of the report and a summary of the survey findings relating to the prevalence of eating disorders among youth in this state. The department may post the report and summary on the department's Internet website. (d) This section expires September 1, 2023. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.