Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1145 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/16/2019

                            By: Johnson, et al. S.B. No. 1145
 (Thompson of Harris, Coleman)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reports on the prevalence of eating disorders and
 eating disorder-related deaths in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The Department of State Health Services, in
 collaboration with the Health and Human Services Commission, shall
 prepare a report on the prevalence of eating disorders and eating
 disorder-related deaths in this state.  The report must include:
 (1)  statewide and regional statistics regarding the
 prevalence of eating disorders and eating disorder-related deaths
 in this state;
 (2)  an overview of national trends in eating
 disorders; and
 (3)  an overview of state-funded behavioral health
 treatment options available to persons with eating disorders.
 (b)  The Department of State Health Services shall gather
 information for the report required by Subsection (a) of this
 section from:
 (1)  information collected by the department and the
 Health and Human Services Commission, including information from
 the vital statistics unit and the state Medicaid program; and
 (2)  hospitals, treatment centers, available surveys,
 and other relevant sources.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the Department of State
 Health Services and the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 prepare and submit to the legislature a copy of the report and any
 recommendations for legislative or other action to reduce the
 prevalence of eating disorders in this state.  The department may
 post the report on the department's Internet website.
 (d)  The Department of State Health Services may accept
 gifts, grants, and donations from any source to fund expenses
 incurred by the department in preparing the report under this
 section.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Department of State Health Services
 shall prepare a report on the prevalence of eating disorders among
 youth in this state.  When administering the Youth Risk Behavior
 Survey created by the federal Centers for Disease Control and
 Prevention to youth in this state, the department may include
 additional questions as necessary to assist the department in
 assessing the prevalence of eating disorders among youth in this
 state for purposes of the report.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2022, the Department of State
 Health Services shall submit to the legislature a copy of the report
 and a summary of the survey findings relating to the prevalence of
 eating disorders among youth in this state.  The department may post
 the report and summary on the department's Internet website.
 (c)  The Department of State Health Services may accept
 gifts, grants, and donations from any source to fund expenses
 incurred by the department in preparing the report under this
 section.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  The Department of State Health Services is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the department
 receives gifts, grants, or donations specifically for that purpose
 or the legislature appropriates money specifically for that
 purpose.  If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose and the department does not receive
 gifts, grants, or donations specifically for that purpose, the
 department may, but is not required to, implement a provision of
 this Act using other appropriations available for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.