3 | 2 | | |
---|
4 | 3 | | |
---|
5 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 6 | | relating to reports on the prevalence of eating disorders and |
---|
8 | 7 | | eating disorder-related deaths in this state. |
---|
9 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 9 | | SECTION 1. (a) The Department of State Health Services, in |
---|
11 | 10 | | collaboration with the Health and Human Services Commission, shall |
---|
12 | 11 | | prepare a report on the prevalence of eating disorders and eating |
---|
13 | 12 | | disorder-related deaths in this state. The report must include: |
---|
14 | 13 | | (1) statewide and regional statistics regarding the |
---|
15 | 14 | | prevalence of eating disorders and eating disorder-related deaths |
---|
16 | 15 | | in this state; |
---|
17 | 16 | | (2) an overview of national trends in eating |
---|
18 | 17 | | disorders; and |
---|
19 | 18 | | (3) an overview of state-funded behavioral health |
---|
20 | 19 | | treatment options available to persons with eating disorders. |
---|
21 | 20 | | (b) The Department of State Health Services shall gather |
---|
22 | 21 | | information for the report required by Subsection (a) of this |
---|
23 | 22 | | section from: |
---|
24 | 23 | | (1) information collected by the department and the |
---|
25 | 24 | | Health and Human Services Commission, including information from |
---|
26 | 25 | | the vital statistics unit and the state Medicaid program; and |
---|
27 | 26 | | (2) hospitals, treatment centers, available surveys, |
---|
28 | 27 | | and other relevant sources. |
---|
29 | 28 | | (c) Not later than December 1, 2020, the Department of State |
---|
30 | 29 | | Health Services and the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
31 | 30 | | prepare and submit to the legislature a copy of the report and any |
---|
32 | 31 | | recommendations for legislative or other action to reduce the |
---|
33 | 32 | | prevalence of eating disorders in this state. The department may |
---|
34 | 33 | | post the report on the department's Internet website. |
---|
35 | 34 | | (d) The Department of State Health Services may accept |
---|
36 | 35 | | gifts, grants, and donations from any source to fund expenses |
---|
37 | 36 | | incurred by the department in preparing the report under this |
---|
38 | 37 | | section. |
---|
39 | 38 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
40 | 39 | | SECTION 2. (a) The Department of State Health Services |
---|
41 | 40 | | shall prepare a report on the prevalence of eating disorders among |
---|
42 | 41 | | youth in this state. When administering the Youth Risk Behavior |
---|
43 | 42 | | Survey created by the federal Centers for Disease Control and |
---|
44 | 43 | | Prevention to youth in this state, the department may include |
---|
45 | 44 | | additional questions as necessary to assist the department in |
---|
46 | 45 | | assessing the prevalence of eating disorders among youth in this |
---|
47 | 46 | | state for purposes of the report. |
---|
48 | 47 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2022, the Department of State |
---|
49 | 48 | | Health Services shall submit to the legislature a copy of the report |
---|
50 | 49 | | and a summary of the survey findings relating to the prevalence of |
---|
51 | 50 | | eating disorders among youth in this state. The department may post |
---|
52 | 51 | | the report and summary on the department's Internet website. |
---|
53 | 52 | | (c) The Department of State Health Services may accept |
---|
54 | 53 | | gifts, grants, and donations from any source to fund expenses |
---|
55 | 54 | | incurred by the department in preparing the report under this |
---|
56 | 55 | | section. |
---|
57 | 56 | | (d) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
58 | 57 | | SECTION 3. The Department of State Health Services is |
---|
59 | 58 | | required to implement a provision of this Act only if the department |
---|
60 | 59 | | receives gifts, grants, or donations specifically for that purpose |
---|
61 | 60 | | or the legislature appropriates money specifically for that |
---|
62 | 61 | | purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money |
---|
63 | 62 | | specifically for that purpose and the department does not receive |
---|
64 | 63 | | gifts, grants, or donations specifically for that purpose, the |
---|
65 | 64 | | department may, but is not required to, implement a provision of |
---|
66 | 65 | | this Act using other appropriations available for that purpose. |
---|
67 | 66 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
68 | 67 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
69 | 68 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
70 | 69 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
71 | 70 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|