10 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 103.0535, Civil Practice and Remedies |
---|
11 | | - | Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection |
---|
12 | | - | (d-1) to read as follows: |
---|
13 | | - | (d) An election under this section must be made not later |
---|
14 | | - | than the 45th day after the date: |
---|
15 | | - | (1) on which the claimant files with the comptroller |
---|
16 | | - | the application required by Section 103.051; or |
---|
17 | | - | (2) on which the claimant experiences one of the |
---|
18 | | - | following life-changing events: |
---|
19 | | - | (A) marriage or divorce of the claimant; |
---|
20 | | - | (B) the addition of a dependent of the claimant; |
---|
21 | | - | or |
---|
22 | | - | (C) the death of a dependent, spouse, or |
---|
23 | | - | beneficiary of the claimant. |
---|
24 | | - | (d-1) An election under Subsection (d) must be made on a |
---|
25 | | - | form prescribed by the comptroller that: |
---|
26 | | - | (1) identifies the claimant's spouse or designated |
---|
27 | | - | beneficiary according to Section 103.0536; and |
---|
28 | | - | (2) specifies the option selected under Subsection |
---|
29 | | - | (c). |
---|
30 | | - | SECTION 2. Section 411.109(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
| 12 | + | SECTION 1. Section 411.109(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
31 | 13 | | to read as follows: |
---|
32 | 14 | | (a) The comptroller is entitled to obtain from the |
---|
33 | 15 | | department criminal history record information maintained by the |
---|
34 | 16 | | department that the comptroller believes is necessary for the |
---|
35 | 17 | | enforcement or administration of Chapter 103, Civil Practice and |
---|
36 | 18 | | Remedies Code, or Chapter 151, 152, 154, 155, or 162, Tax Code, |
---|
37 | 19 | | including criminal history record information that relates to a |
---|
38 | 20 | | person who is: |
---|
39 | 21 | | (1) an applicant for a permit under any of those |
---|
40 | 22 | | chapters; |
---|
41 | 23 | | (2) a permit holder under any of those chapters; |
---|
42 | 24 | | (3) an officer, director, stockholder owning 10 |
---|
43 | 25 | | percent or more of the outstanding stock, partner, owner, or |
---|
44 | 26 | | managing employee of an applicant or permit holder under any of |
---|
45 | 27 | | those chapters that is a corporation, association, joint venture, |
---|
46 | 28 | | syndicate, partnership, or proprietorship; |
---|
47 | 29 | | (4) believed to have violated any of those chapters; |
---|
48 | 30 | | [or] |
---|
49 | 31 | | (5) being considered by the comptroller for employment |
---|
50 | 32 | | as a peace officer; or |
---|
51 | 33 | | (6) receiving, scheduled to receive, or applying to |
---|
52 | 34 | | receive compensation under Chapter 103, Civil Practice and Remedies |
---|
53 | 35 | | Code. |
---|
54 | | - | SECTION 3. (a) Notwithstanding Section 103.0535(d), Civil |
---|
55 | | - | Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, a person |
---|
56 | | - | entitled to compensation under Section 103.001(a), Civil Practice |
---|
57 | | - | and Remedies Code, who started receiving annuity payments before |
---|
58 | | - | the effective date of this Act may elect to receive any remaining |
---|
59 | | - | payments as alternative annuity payments under Section 103.0535, |
---|
60 | | - | Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, by filing |
---|
61 | | - | the form described by Section 103.0535(d-1), Civil Practice and |
---|
62 | | - | Remedies Code, as added by this Act, with the comptroller after |
---|
63 | | - | December 31, 2019, and before March 1, 2020. The value of |
---|
64 | | - | alternative annuity payments elected under this subsection must be |
---|
65 | | - | actuarially equivalent to the remaining value of the annuity |
---|
66 | | - | payments the person would receive absent the election. This |
---|
67 | | - | subsection does not affect the ability of a person described by this |
---|
68 | | - | subsection to make an election under Section 103.0535(d), Civil |
---|
69 | | - | Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, following a |
---|
70 | | - | life-changing event described by that subsection. |
---|
71 | | - | (b) Not later than December 1, 2019, the comptroller shall |
---|
72 | | - | provide notice to all persons entitled to compensation under |
---|
73 | | - | Section 103.001(a), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, of: |
---|
74 | | - | (1) the opportunity described by Subsection (a) of |
---|
75 | | - | this section to elect to receive alternative annuity payments under |
---|
76 | | - | Section 103.0535, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by |
---|
77 | | - | this Act; and |
---|
78 | | - | (2) the opportunity to elect to receive alternative |
---|
79 | | - | annuity payments after a life-changing event under Section |
---|
80 | | - | 103.0535(d), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this |
---|
81 | | - | Act. |
---|
82 | | - | (c) The comptroller shall provide the notice required by |
---|
83 | | - | Subsection (b) of this section by: |
---|
84 | | - | (1) certified mail to a person's last known address; |
---|
85 | | - | and |
---|
86 | | - | (2) phone call to the phone number that the |
---|
87 | | - | comptroller has on file for the person. |
---|
88 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
| 36 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
93 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
94 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
95 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1151 passed the Senate on |
---|
96 | | - | April 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; |
---|
97 | | - | May 23, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and |
---|
98 | | - | requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2019, House |
---|
99 | | - | granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2019, Senate adopted |
---|
100 | | - | Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 31, |
---|
101 | | - | Nays 0. |
---|
102 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
103 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
104 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1151 passed the House, with |
---|
105 | | - | amendments, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, |
---|
106 | | - | Nays 0, one present not voting; May 23, 2019, House granted request |
---|
107 | | - | of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; |
---|
108 | | - | May 26, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the |
---|
109 | | - | following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, one present not voting. |
---|
110 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
111 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
112 | | - | Approved: |
---|
113 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
114 | | - | Date |
---|
115 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
116 | | - | Governor |
---|