Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1151 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            S.B. No. 1151


 AN ACT
 relating to the comptroller's access to criminal history record
 information of wrongfully imprisoned persons and certain annuity
 payments payable to surviving spouses and designated beneficiaries
 of those persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 103.0535, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection
 (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d)  An election under this section must be made not later
 than the 45th day after the date:
 (1)  on which the claimant files with the comptroller
 the application required by Section 103.051; or
 (2)  on which the claimant experiences one of the
 following life-changing events:
 (A)  marriage or divorce of the claimant;
 (B)  the addition of a dependent of the claimant;
 or
 (C)  the death of a dependent, spouse, or
 beneficiary of the claimant.
 (d-1)  An election under Subsection (d) must be made on a
 form prescribed by the comptroller that:
 (1)  identifies the claimant's spouse or designated
 beneficiary according to Section 103.0536; and
 (2)  specifies the option selected under Subsection
 (c).
 SECTION 2.  Section 411.109(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The comptroller is entitled to obtain from the
 department criminal history record information maintained by the
 department that the comptroller believes is necessary for the
 enforcement or administration of Chapter 103, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, or Chapter 151, 152, 154, 155, or 162, Tax Code,
 including criminal history record information that relates to a
 person who is:
 (1)  an applicant for a permit under any of those
 chapters;
 (2)  a permit holder under any of those chapters;
 (3)  an officer, director, stockholder owning 10
 percent or more of the outstanding stock, partner, owner, or
 managing employee of an applicant or permit holder under any of
 those chapters that is a corporation, association, joint venture,
 syndicate, partnership, or proprietorship;
 (4)  believed to have violated any of those chapters;
 [or]
 (5)  being considered by the comptroller for employment
 as a peace officer; or
 (6)  receiving, scheduled to receive, or applying to
 receive compensation under Chapter 103, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Notwithstanding Section 103.0535(d), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, a person
 entitled to compensation under Section 103.001(a), Civil Practice
 and Remedies Code, who started receiving annuity payments before
 the effective date of this Act may elect to receive any remaining
 payments as alternative annuity payments under Section 103.0535,
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, by filing
 the form described by Section 103.0535(d-1), Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, as added by this Act, with the comptroller after
 December 31, 2019, and before March 1, 2020. The value of
 alternative annuity payments elected under this subsection must be
 actuarially equivalent to the remaining value of the annuity
 payments the person would receive absent the election.  This
 subsection does not affect the ability of a person described by this
 subsection to make an election under Section 103.0535(d), Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this Act, following a
 life-changing event described by that subsection.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2019, the comptroller shall
 provide notice to all persons entitled to compensation under
 Section 103.001(a), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, of:
 (1)  the opportunity described by Subsection (a) of
 this section to elect to receive alternative annuity payments under
 Section 103.0535, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by
 this Act; and
 (2)  the opportunity to elect to receive alternative
 annuity payments after a life-changing event under Section
 103.0535(d), Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as amended by this
 Act.
 (c)  The comptroller shall provide the notice required by
 Subsection (b) of this section by:
 (1)  certified mail to a person's last known address;
 and
 (2)  phone call to the phone number that the
 comptroller has on file for the person.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1151 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2019, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2019, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1151 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 23, 2019, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 26, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor