Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 18, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019