Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1152 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1152
1+86R24600 JXC-F
2+ By: Hancock S.B. No. 1152
3+ (Phelan)
4+ Substitute the following for S.B. No. 1152: No.
25
36
7+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
48 AN ACT
59 relating to the payment of certain fees to municipalities by
610 entities that provide telecommunications and cable or video
711 services.
812 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
913 SECTION 1. Section 283.051, Local Government Code, is
1014 amended by adding Subsections (d), (e), and (f) to read as follows:
1115 (d) In this subsection, "affiliated group" has the meaning
1216 assigned by Section 171.0001, Tax Code. A certificated
1317 telecommunications provider is not required to pay any compensation
1418 under Subsection (a) for a given calendar year if the provider
1519 determines that the sum of the compensation due from the provider
1620 and any member of the provider's affiliated group to all
1721 municipalities in this state under Subsection (a) is less than the
1822 sum of the fees due from the provider and any member of the
1923 provider's affiliated group to all municipalities in this state
2024 under Section 66.005, Utilities Code. The determination under this
2125 subsection for a given year must be based on amounts actually paid,
2226 or amounts that would have been paid notwithstanding this
2327 subsection, during the 12-month period ending June 30 of the
2428 immediately preceding calendar year by the provider and any member
2529 of the provider's affiliated group. In the case of a conflict
2630 between this subsection and Section 283.055, this subsection
2731 prevails.
2832 (e) Notwithstanding the aggregate amount of compensation or
2933 fees paid in this state calculated under Subsection (d), Subsection
3034 (d) does not exempt a certificated telecommunications provider from
3135 paying compensation under Subsection (a) to a municipality if the
3236 provider is not required to pay a fee authorized by Section 66.005,
3337 Utilities Code, or another fee described in 47 U.S.C. Section
3438 542(g), to that municipality. This subsection applies only to a
3539 municipality described in this subsection and does not limit the
3640 application of Subsection (d) to any other municipality.
3741 (f) A certificated telecommunications provider shall file,
3842 not later than October 1 of each year, an annual written
3943 notification with each municipality in which the provider provides
4044 telecommunications services of the provider's requirement to pay
4145 compensation under Subsection (a) or exemption from the requirement
4246 to pay compensation under Subsection (d) for the following calendar
4347 year.
4448 SECTION 2. Section 66.005, Utilities Code, is amended by
4549 adding Subsections (d), (e), and (f) to read as follows:
4650 (d) In this subsection, "affiliated group" has the meaning
4751 assigned by Section 171.0001, Tax Code. A holder of a state-issued
4852 certificate of franchise authority is not subject to the fee
4953 imposed under Subsection (a) for a given calendar year if the holder
5054 determines that the sum of fees due from the holder and any member
5155 of the holder's affiliated group to all municipalities in this
5256 state under Subsection (a) is less than the sum of the compensation
5357 due from the holder and any member of the holder's affiliated group
5458 to all municipalities in this state under Section 283.051, Local
5559 Government Code. The determination under this subsection for a
5660 given year must be based on amounts actually paid, or amounts that
5761 would have been paid notwithstanding this subsection, during the
5862 12-month period ending June 30 of the immediately preceding
5963 calendar year by the holder and any member of the holder's
6064 affiliated group. In the case of a conflict between this subsection
6165 and Section 283.055, Local Government Code, this subsection
6266 prevails.
6367 (e) Notwithstanding the aggregate amount of compensation or
6468 fees paid in this state calculated under Subsection (d), Subsection
6569 (d) does not exempt a holder of a state-issued certificate of
6670 franchise authority from paying the fee imposed under Subsection
6771 (a) to a municipality if the holder is not required to pay
6872 compensation under Section 283.051, Local Government Code, to that
6973 municipality. This subsection applies only to a municipality
7074 described in this subsection and does not limit the application of
7175 Subsection (d) to any other municipality. Nothing in this
7276 subsection affects the application of Section 66.006 or 66.009 to
7377 any holder of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority.
7478 (f) A holder of a state-issued certificate of franchise
7579 authority shall file, not later than October 1 of each year, an
7680 annual written notification with each municipality in which the
7781 holder provides cable or video services of the holder's requirement
7882 to pay the fee under Subsection (a) or exemption from the
7983 requirement to pay the fee under Subsection (d) for the following
8084 calendar year.
8185 SECTION 3. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
8286 only to a payment made on or after January 1, 2020. A payment made
8387 before January 1, 2020, is governed by the law in effect on the date
8488 the payment was made, and the former law is continued in effect for
8589 that purpose.
8690 (b) A determination of compensation or fees described by
8791 Section 283.051(d), Local Government Code, as added by this Act, or
8892 Section 66.005(d), Utilities Code, as added by this Act, for the
8993 year 2020 must be based on amounts actually paid between July 1,
9094 2018, and June 30, 2019.
9195 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
92- ______________________________ ______________________________
93- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
94- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1152 passed the Senate on
95- April 4, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5; and that the
96- Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
97- following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
98- ______________________________
99- Secretary of the Senate
100- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1152 passed the House, with
101- amendment, on May 9, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 92, Nays 50,
102- two present not voting.
103- ______________________________
104- Chief Clerk of the House
105- Approved:
106- ______________________________
107- Date
108- ______________________________
109- Governor