Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1200 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 1200
1+By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 1200
2+ (Miller, Sheffield)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the authority of certain military spouses to engage in a
68 business or occupation in this state.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Chapter 55, Occupations Code, is amended by
911 adding Section 55.0041 to read as follows:
1012 Sec. 55.0041. RECOGNITION OF OUT-OF-STATE LICENSE OF
1113 MILITARY SPOUSE. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a military
1214 spouse may engage in a business or occupation for which a license is
1315 required without obtaining the applicable license if the spouse is
1416 currently licensed in good standing by another jurisdiction that
1517 has licensing requirements that are substantially equivalent to the
1618 requirements for the license in this state.
1719 (b) Before engaging in the practice of the business or
1820 occupation, the military spouse must:
1921 (1) notify the applicable state agency of the spouse's
2022 intent to practice in this state;
2123 (2) submit to the agency proof of the spouse's
2224 residency in this state and a copy of the spouse's military
2325 identification card; and
2426 (3) receive from the agency confirmation that:
2527 (A) the agency has verified the spouse's license
2628 in the other jurisdiction; and
2729 (B) the spouse is authorized to engage in the
2830 business or occupation in accordance with this section.
2931 (c) The military spouse shall comply with all other laws and
3032 regulations applicable to the business or occupation in this state.
3133 (d) A military spouse may engage in the business or
3234 occupation under the authority of this section only for the period
3335 during which the military service member to whom the military
3436 spouse is married is stationed at a military installation in this
3537 state but not to exceed three years from the date the spouse
3638 receives the confirmation described by Subsection (b)(3).
3739 (e) A state agency that issues a license shall adopt rules
3840 to implement this section. The rules must establish a process for
3941 the agency to:
4042 (1) identify, with respect to each type of license
4143 issued by the agency, the jurisdictions that have licensing
4244 requirements that are substantially equivalent to the requirements
4345 for the license in this state; and
4446 (2) verify that a military spouse is licensed in good
4547 standing in a jurisdiction described by Subdivision (1).
46- (f) In addition to the rules adopted under Subsection (e), a
47- state agency that issues a license may adopt rules to provide for
48- the issuance of a license to a military spouse to whom the agency
49- provides confirmation under Subsection (b)(3). A license issued
50- under this subsection must expire not later than the third
51- anniversary of the date the agency provided the confirmation and
52- may not be renewed. A state agency may not charge a fee for the
53- issuance of the license.
5448 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2019, a state agency
5549 to which Section 55.0041, Occupations Code, as added by this Act,
5650 applies, shall adopt rules to implement that section.
5751 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
58- ______________________________ ______________________________
59- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
60- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1200 passed the Senate on
61- April 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
62- the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
63- following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
64- ______________________________
65- Secretary of the Senate
66- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1200 passed the House, with
67- amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
68- Nays 0, two present not voting.
69- ______________________________
70- Chief Clerk of the House
71- Approved:
72- ______________________________
73- Date
74- ______________________________
75- Governor