Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1200 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 1200


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain military spouses to engage in a
 business or occupation in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 55, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Section 55.0041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 55.0041.  RECOGNITION OF OUT-OF-STATE LICENSE OF
 MILITARY SPOUSE. (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, a military
 spouse may engage in a business or occupation for which a license is
 required without obtaining the applicable license if the spouse is
 currently licensed in good standing by another jurisdiction that
 has licensing requirements that are substantially equivalent to the
 requirements for the license in this state.
 (b)  Before engaging in the practice of the business or
 occupation, the military spouse must:
 (1)  notify the applicable state agency of the spouse's
 intent to practice in this state;
 (2)  submit to the agency proof of the spouse's
 residency in this state and a copy of the spouse's military
 identification card; and
 (3)  receive from the agency confirmation that:
 (A)  the agency has verified the spouse's license
 in the other jurisdiction; and
 (B)  the spouse is authorized to engage in the
 business or occupation in accordance with this section.
 (c)  The military spouse shall comply with all other laws and
 regulations applicable to the business or occupation in this state.
 (d)  A military spouse may engage in the business or
 occupation under the authority of this section only for the period
 during which the military service member to whom the military
 spouse is married is stationed at a military installation in this
 state but not to exceed three years from the date the spouse
 receives the confirmation described by Subsection (b)(3).
 (e)  A state agency that issues a license shall adopt rules
 to implement this section.  The rules must establish a process for
 the agency to:
 (1)  identify, with respect to each type of license
 issued by the agency, the jurisdictions that have licensing
 requirements that are substantially equivalent to the requirements
 for the license in this state; and
 (2)  verify that a military spouse is licensed in good
 standing in a jurisdiction described by Subdivision (1).
 (f)  In addition to the rules adopted under Subsection (e), a
 state agency that issues a license may adopt rules to provide for
 the issuance of a license to a military spouse to whom the agency
 provides confirmation under Subsection (b)(3). A license issued
 under this subsection must expire not later than the third
 anniversary of the date the agency provided the confirmation and
 may not be renewed. A state agency may not charge a fee for the
 issuance of the license.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2019, a state agency
 to which Section 55.0041, Occupations Code, as added by this Act,
 applies, shall adopt rules to implement that section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1200 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1200 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor