Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2019
Bill May 3, 2019