Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB124 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2019
Bill March 13, 2019