Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019