Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1468 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/21/2019

                            S.B. No. 1468


 AN ACT
 relating to annexation by certain municipalities of a special
 district under a strategic partnership agreement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.0751(s), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (s)  Notwithstanding any other law other than Section
 43.083, the procedures prescribed by Subchapters C-3, C-4, and C-5
 do not apply to the annexation of an area under this section.
 Except as provided by Subsection (h), a municipality shall follow
 the procedures established under the strategic partnership
 agreement for full-purpose annexation of an area under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.083 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.083.  ANNEXATION BY CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES THAT
 OPERATE MUNICIPALLY OWNED WATER UTILITY.  (a)  This section applies
 only to a municipality that:
 (1)  operates a municipally owned water utility; and
 (2)  is a party to a strategic partnership agreement:
 (A)  with a municipal utility district; and
 (B)  under which the municipality contemplates
 annexing 400 or more water or wastewater connections that are not
 located in the district.
 (b)  A municipality authorized or required to annex a
 district for full purposes under a strategic partnership agreement
 under Section 43.0751:
 (1)  may not annex the district without also annexing
 all of the unincorporated area served by the district that is
 located in the municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction; and
 (2)  must receive approval for the annexations under
 the agreement and Subdivision (1) as required by Subchapter C-3,
 C-4, or C-5, as applicable, before annexation.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1468 passed the Senate on
 May 2, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 6; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1468 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134,
 Nays 7, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor