Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1570 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019