05/07/2019 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |||
05/07/2019 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/29/2019 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/25/2019 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | House passage reported | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Record vote RV#546 | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Passed | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2270 | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Referred to Energy Resources | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |