Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1587 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019