Senate | 04/23/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Criminal Justice | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |