Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1698 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/23/2019

                            By: Whitmire S.B. No. 1698
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 14, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 23, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 23, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1698 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain juvenile offenders to be
 transferred to criminal court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 54.02(a) and (j), Family Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The juvenile court may waive its exclusive original
 jurisdiction and transfer a child to the appropriate district court
 or criminal district court for criminal proceedings if:
 (1)  the child is alleged to have violated a penal law
 of the grade of felony;
 (2)  the child was:
 (A)  14 years of age or older at the time the child
 [he] is alleged to have committed the offense, if the offense is a
 capital felony, an aggravated controlled substance felony, or a
 felony of the first degree, and no adjudication hearing has been
 conducted concerning that offense; or
 (B)  15 years of age or older at the time the child
 is alleged to have committed the offense, if the offense is a felony
 of the second or third degree [or a state jail felony], and no
 adjudication hearing has been conducted concerning that offense;
 and
 (3)  after a full investigation and a hearing, the
 juvenile court determines that there is probable cause to believe
 that the child before the court committed the offense alleged and
 that because of the seriousness of the offense alleged or the
 background of the child the welfare of the community requires
 criminal proceedings.
 (j)  The juvenile court may waive its exclusive original
 jurisdiction and transfer a person to the appropriate district
 court or criminal district court for criminal proceedings if:
 (1)  the person is 18 years of age or older;
 (2)  the person was:
 (A)  10 years of age or older and under 17 years of
 age at the time the person is alleged to have committed a capital
 felony or an offense under Section 19.02, Penal Code;
 (B)  14 years of age or older and under 17 years of
 age at the time the person is alleged to have committed an
 aggravated controlled substance felony or a felony of the first
 degree other than an offense under Section 19.02, Penal Code; or
 (C)  15 years of age or older and under 17 years of
 age at the time the person is alleged to have committed a felony of
 the second or third degree [or a state jail felony];
 (3)  no adjudication concerning the alleged offense has
 been made or no adjudication hearing concerning the offense has
 been conducted;
 (4)  the juvenile court finds from a preponderance of
 the evidence that:
 (A)  for a reason beyond the control of the state
 it was not practicable to proceed in juvenile court before the 18th
 birthday of the person; or
 (B)  after due diligence of the state it was not
 practicable to proceed in juvenile court before the 18th birthday
 of the person because:
 (i)  the state did not have probable cause to
 proceed in juvenile court and new evidence has been found since the
 18th birthday of the person;
 (ii)  the person could not be found; or
 (iii)  a previous transfer order was
 reversed by an appellate court or set aside by a district court; and
 (5)  the juvenile court determines that there is
 probable cause to believe that the child before the court committed
 the offense alleged.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to conduct that occurs on
 or after the effective date of this Act.  Conduct that occurs before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the conduct occurred, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose. For the purposes of this section, conduct
 occurred before the effective date of this Act if any element of the
 conduct occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *