Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1845 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            S.B. No. 1845


 AN ACT
 relating to the amendment of the dedicatory instruments of certain
 mixed-use real estate developments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 11, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 214 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 214.  AMENDMENT OF DEDICATORY INSTRUMENTS OF CERTAIN
 MIXED-USE REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENTS
 Sec. 214.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Current developer" means an owner of one or more
 tracts or lots in a mixed-use real estate development, or the
 owner's affiliate, who:
 (A)  is the current declarant in the declaration
 governing the development; and
 (B)  currently holds the developer rights for the
 development.
 (2)  "Declaration" means an instrument filed in the
 real property records of a county that includes restrictive
 covenants governing a real estate development.
 (3)  "Dedicatory instrument" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 202.001.
 (4)  "Mixed-use real estate development" means a real
 estate development that:
 (A)  contains at least 200 acres and not more than
 250 acres of deed-restricted property composed of at least 10
 separate tracts or parcels of property;
 (B)  includes:
 (i)  commercial properties, including hotel
 and retail properties, that constitute at least 70 percent of the
 total land area of the development; and
 (ii)  office properties that constitute at
 least 50 percent of the total land area of the development;
 (C)  may include other real estate uses;
 (D)  is governed by a property owners'
 association; and
 (E)  is subject to a dedicatory instrument that:
 (i)  requires mandatory membership in the
 property owners' association;
 (ii)  authorizes the property owners'
 association to collect a regular assessment on all or a majority of
 the property in the development;
 (iii)  requires the approval of owners of
 more than:
 (a)  90 percent of the ground area
 constituting the development to change a provision of the
 dedicatory instrument governing the permitted use of a property; or
 (b)  60 percent of the ground area
 constituting the development to change a provision of the
 dedicatory instrument that is not related to the permitted use of a
 property; and
 (iv)  provides that voting for an amendment
 is based on the number of acres owned by each owner.
 (5)  "Property owners' association" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 202.001.
 Sec. 214.002.  APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a)  This chapter
 applies only to a mixed-use real estate development that is located
 in:
 (1)  a municipality with a population of two million or
 more; and
 (2)  a county with a population of 3.3 million or more.
 (b)  This chapter does not apply to:
 (1)  a mixed-use real estate development that includes
 single-family residential properties; or
 (2)  a condominium subject to Chapter 81 or 82.
 (c)  This chapter applies to a dedicatory instrument
 regardless of the date on which the dedicatory instrument was
 created.
 Sec. 214.003.  AMENDMENT OF DEDICATORY INSTRUMENT.
 (a)  This section supersedes any conflicting requirement in a
 dedicatory instrument of a mixed-use real estate development.
 (b)  To the extent of any conflict with another provision of
 this title, this section prevails.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), a declaration of a
 mixed-use real estate development may be amended only by a vote of a
 majority of the total votes allocated to property owners entitled
 to vote on the amendment of the declaration.
 (d)  If the declaration contains a lower approval
 requirement than prescribed by Subsection (c), the approval
 requirement in the declaration controls.  If the declaration is
 silent as to voting rights for an amendment, the declaration may be
 amended by a vote of a majority of the total votes allocated to
 property owners entitled to vote on the amendment of the
 declaration.
 (e)  While the mixed-use real estate development has a
 current developer, an amendment made to the declaration under this
 section requires the current developer to consent to the amendment
 to be valid.
 (f)  A bylaw of a mixed-use real estate development may not
 be amended to conflict with this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1845 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 4; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1845 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 4, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor