23 | | - | SECTION 3. Subtitle G, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended |
---|
24 | | - | by adding Chapter 1509 to read as follows: |
---|
25 | | - | CHAPTER 1509. SHORT-TERM LIMITED-DURATION INSURANCE |
---|
26 | | - | Sec. 1509.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "short-term |
---|
27 | | - | limited-duration insurance" has the meaning assigned by 26 C.F.R. |
---|
28 | | - | Section 54.9801-2. |
---|
29 | | - | Sec. 1509.002. POLICY DISCLOSURE FORM. (a) The |
---|
30 | | - | commissioner by rule shall prescribe a disclosure form to be |
---|
31 | | - | provided with a short-term limited-duration insurance policy and |
---|
32 | | - | application. |
---|
33 | | - | (b) The disclosure form must be in an easily readable font |
---|
34 | | - | at least 14-point in size and include: |
---|
35 | | - | (1) the duration of coverage; |
---|
36 | | - | (2) a statement: |
---|
37 | | - | (A) of the number of times the policy may be |
---|
38 | | - | renewed or that the policy may not be renewed, as applicable; |
---|
39 | | - | (B) that the expiration of short-term coverage is |
---|
40 | | - | not a qualifying life event that would make a person eligible for a |
---|
41 | | - | special enrollment period; and |
---|
42 | | - | (C) that the policy may expire outside of the |
---|
43 | | - | open enrollment period; |
---|
44 | | - | (3) to the extent the information is available, the |
---|
45 | | - | dates of the next three open enrollment periods under the Patient |
---|
46 | | - | Protection and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148) following |
---|
47 | | - | the date the policy expires; |
---|
48 | | - | (4) whether the policy contains any limitations or |
---|
49 | | - | exclusions to preexisting conditions; |
---|
50 | | - | (5) the maximum dollar amount payable under the |
---|
51 | | - | policy; |
---|
52 | | - | (6) the deductibles under the policy and the health |
---|
53 | | - | care services to which the deductibles apply; |
---|
54 | | - | (7) whether the following health care services are |
---|
55 | | - | covered, including: |
---|
56 | | - | (A) prescription drug coverage; |
---|
57 | | - | (B) mental health services; |
---|
58 | | - | (C) substance abuse treatment; |
---|
59 | | - | (D) maternity care; |
---|
60 | | - | (E) hospitalization; |
---|
61 | | - | (F) surgery; |
---|
62 | | - | (G) emergency health care; and |
---|
63 | | - | (H) preventive health care; and |
---|
64 | | - | (8) any other information the commissioner determines |
---|
65 | | - | is important for a purchaser of a short-term limited-duration |
---|
66 | | - | insurance policy. |
---|
67 | | - | (c) An insurer issuing a short-term limited-duration |
---|
68 | | - | insurance policy shall adopt procedures in accordance with |
---|
69 | | - | commissioner rule to obtain a signed form from the insured |
---|
70 | | - | acknowledging receipt of the disclosure form described by this |
---|
71 | | - | section. The rule must allow for electronic acknowledgment. The |
---|
72 | | - | insurer shall retain an acknowledgment form until the fifth |
---|
73 | | - | anniversary of the date the insurer receives the form, and the |
---|
74 | | - | insurer shall make the form available to the department on request. |
---|
75 | | - | SECTION 4. Chapter 1507, Insurance Code, as amended by this |
---|
76 | | - | Act, applies only to a policy or evidence of coverage delivered, |
---|
77 | | - | issued for delivery, or renewed on or after the effective date of |
---|
78 | | - | this Act. A policy or evidence of coverage delivered, issued for |
---|
79 | | - | delivery, or renewed before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
80 | | - | governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective |
---|
81 | | - | date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that |
---|
82 | | - | purpose. |
---|
83 | | - | SECTION 5. Not later than January 1, 2020, the commissioner |
---|
84 | | - | of insurance shall prescribe the disclosure form required by |
---|
85 | | - | Section 1509.002, Insurance Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
86 | | - | SECTION 6. Chapter 1509, Insurance Code, as added by this |
---|
87 | | - | Act, applies only to an insurance policy delivered, issued for |
---|
88 | | - | delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2020. An insurance |
---|
89 | | - | policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1, |
---|
90 | | - | 2020, is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the |
---|
91 | | - | effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for |
---|
92 | | - | that purpose. |
---|
93 | | - | SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
94 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
95 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
96 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1852 passed the Senate on |
---|
97 | | - | April 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
98 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 23, 2019, by the |
---|
99 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
100 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
101 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
102 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1852 passed the House, with |
---|
103 | | - | amendment, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, |
---|
104 | | - | Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
105 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
106 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
107 | | - | Approved: |
---|
108 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
109 | | - | Date |
---|
110 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
111 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 25 | + | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
| 26 | + | to a policy or evidence of coverage delivered, issued for delivery, |
---|
| 27 | + | or renewed on or after the effective date of this Act. A policy or |
---|
| 28 | + | evidence of coverage delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed |
---|
| 29 | + | before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law as it |
---|
| 30 | + | existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that |
---|
| 31 | + | law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
| 32 | + | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|