Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1852 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/23/2019

                            S.B. No. 1852


 AN ACT
 relating to disclosures required in connection with the issuance of
 certain health benefit plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1507.006(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Each applicant for initial coverage [and each
 policyholder on renewal of coverage] must sign the disclosure
 statement provided by the health carrier under Subsection (a) and
 return the statement to the health carrier.  Under a group policy or
 contract, the term "applicant" means the employer.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1507.056(b), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Each applicant for initial enrollment [and each
 contract holder on renewal] must sign the disclosure statement
 provided by the health maintenance organization under Subsection
 (a) and return the statement to the health maintenance
 organization.  Under a group evidence of coverage, the term
 "applicant" means the employer.
 SECTION 3.  Subtitle G, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1509 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1509.  SHORT-TERM LIMITED-DURATION INSURANCE
 Sec. 1509.001.  DEFINITION.  In this chapter, "short-term
 limited-duration insurance" has the meaning assigned by 26 C.F.R.
 Section 54.9801-2.
 Sec. 1509.002.  POLICY DISCLOSURE FORM. (a)  The
 commissioner by rule shall prescribe a disclosure form to be
 provided with a short-term limited-duration insurance policy and
 application.
 (b)  The disclosure form must be in an easily readable font
 at least 14-point in size and include:
 (1)  the duration of coverage;
 (2)  a statement:
 (A)  of the number of times the policy may be
 renewed or that the policy may not be renewed, as applicable;
 (B)  that the expiration of short-term coverage is
 not a qualifying life event that would make a person eligible for a
 special enrollment period; and
 (C)  that the policy may expire outside of the
 open enrollment period;
 (3)  to the extent the information is available, the
 dates of the next three open enrollment periods under the Patient
 Protection and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148) following
 the date the policy expires;
 (4)  whether the policy contains any limitations or
 exclusions to preexisting conditions;
 (5)  the maximum dollar amount payable under the
 policy;
 (6)  the deductibles under the policy and the health
 care services to which the deductibles apply;
 (7)  whether the following health care services are
 covered, including:
 (A)  prescription drug coverage;
 (B)  mental health services;
 (C)  substance abuse treatment;
 (D)  maternity care;
 (E)  hospitalization;
 (F)  surgery;
 (G)  emergency health care; and
 (H)  preventive health care; and
 (8)  any other information the commissioner determines
 is important for a purchaser of a short-term limited-duration
 insurance policy.
 (c)  An insurer issuing a short-term limited-duration
 insurance policy shall adopt procedures in accordance with
 commissioner rule to obtain a signed form from the insured
 acknowledging receipt of the disclosure form described by this
 section. The rule must allow for electronic acknowledgment.  The
 insurer shall retain an acknowledgment form until the fifth
 anniversary of the date the insurer receives the form, and the
 insurer shall make the form available to the department on request.
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 1507, Insurance Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies only to a policy or evidence of coverage delivered,
 issued for delivery, or renewed on or after the effective date of
 this Act.  A policy or evidence of coverage delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law as it existed immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than January 1, 2020, the commissioner
 of insurance shall prescribe the disclosure form required by
 Section 1509.002, Insurance Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  Chapter 1509, Insurance Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to an insurance policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2020. An insurance
 policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before January 1,
 2020, is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1852 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1852 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor