Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1876 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019