Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1876 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2019

                            S.B. No. 1876


 AN ACT
 relating to a request for binding arbitration to appeal appraisal
 review board orders involving two or more contiguous tracts of
 land.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41A.03(a-1), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a-1)  If a property owner requests binding arbitration
 under this chapter to appeal appraisal review board orders
 involving two or more contiguous tracts of land that are owned by
 the property owner [contiguous to one another], a single
 arbitration deposit in the amount provided by Subsection (a)(2) is
 sufficient to satisfy the requirement of Subsection (a)(2). For
 purposes of this subsection, "contiguous tracts of land" means
 improved or unimproved tracts of land that are touching or that
 share a common boundary, as determined using appraisal district
 records or legal descriptions of the tracts.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for binding arbitration under Chapter 41A, Tax Code, that
 is filed on or after the effective date of this Act.  A request for
 binding arbitration under Chapter 41A, Tax Code, that is filed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the request is filed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1876 passed the Senate on
 May 2, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 24, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1876 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor