Senate | 05/01/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |