Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1899 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2019

                    By: Fallon S.B. No. 1899
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2019; March 18, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the dismissal of certain actions relating to Medicaid
 fraud.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 36.102, Human Resources
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 36.102.  INITIATION OF ACTION; CONSENT REQUIRED FOR
 DISMISSAL.
 SECTION 2.  Section 36.102(e), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  An action under this subchapter may be dismissed [before
 the end of the period during which the petition remains under seal]
 only if the court and the attorney general consent in writing to the
 dismissal and state their reasons for consenting.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an action brought on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 action brought before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law applicable to the action immediately before the effective
 date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *