Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1939 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019