Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1947 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/19/2019

                            S.B. No. 1947


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of the prescribing and dispensing of
 controlled substances by veterinarians.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 481.0766, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The board shall make the information reported under
 Subsection (a) available to the State Board of Veterinary Medical
 Examiners for the purpose of routine inspections and
 investigations.
 SECTION 2.  Section 801.307, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The board shall require a veterinarian to complete two
 hours of continuing education related to opioid abuse and
 controlled substance diversion, inventory, and security every two
 years to renew a license to practice veterinary medicine.
 SECTION 3.  Section 801.307(a-1), Occupations Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to the renewal of a license to practice
 veterinary medicine on or after September 1, 2020. The renewal of a
 license before that date is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1947 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1947 passed the House on
 May 17, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 8, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor