Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB195 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019